Hamer, Diana Renata (CPSO#: 53073)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Piotrowski, Diana Renata (used until: 19 Aug 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017