Hamid, Muhammad Akhter (CPSO#: 94134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 2016

Expiry Date:  19 Jan 2023

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Jan 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Rouge Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 7234
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Jan 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jan 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Muhammad Akhter Hamid may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in which Dr. Hamid holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr. Hamid no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr. Hamid's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Hamid's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  January 20, 2016.  In accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate  will,  if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on January 19, 2023.