Hamid, Zinia (CPSO#: 102895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 May 2014

Expiry Date:  13 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 May 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:University of Chittagong, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Warden Woods Medical Centre Two
2928 Danforth Avenue
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M4C 1M1
Phone: (647) 346-5306
Fax: (647) 748-5305
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Warden Woods Medical Centre
99 Firvalley Crt
Scarborough, ON
Toronto ON  M1L 1P2
Canada
Phone: (416) 694-7400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 May 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 May 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Zinia Hamid may practise family medicine, in Toronto, Ontario, while
                  under  supervision  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College
                  at:

                  (i)   Warden Woods Medical Centre; and
                  
                  (ii)  Warden Woods Medical Centre - Two.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  will automatically expire
                  on May 13, 2018. 

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Hamid's  knowledge,  skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College  by  the  due  date  or  if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Hamid's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on May 14, 2014, and will expire on  or before
                  May 13, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.