Hamideh, Fayad (CPSO#: 92023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Aug 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Damascus, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1011 Upper Middle Road East
MCI Medical Clinic, Suite # E9
Oakville ON  L6H 4L1
Phone: (905) 849-7007
Fax: (905) 849-7883
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

640 Eglinton Avenue West
Unit 103
Mississauga ON  L5R 3V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 268-0520
Fax: (905) 268-0521
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: (905) 897-0788
Fax: (905) 897-9229
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fayad Hamideh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hamideh ( CPSO# 92023 )

Business Address:
MCI Doctor's Office
Suite E9
1011 Upper Middle Road East
Oakville ON  L6H 4L1
Phone Number: (905) 849-7007

Business Address:
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-0788

Business Address:
Suite 103
640 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5R 3V2
Phone Number: (905) 268-0520

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Aug 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 24 Aug 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 14 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Feb 2011 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Fayad  Hamideh  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  internal
            medicine and 
                  rheumatology, only.