Hamielec, Cindy Maia (CPSO#: 50670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Science Corporation
Hamilton General Site
McMaster Clinics, Room 436
237 Barton Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44550
Fax: (905) 577-1466
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Hamielec Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hamielec ( CPSO# 50670 )

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
436 - 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
50 Charlton Aveune East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CINDY MAIA HAMIELEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMIELEC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1985