Hamilton, Alan William (CPSO#: 52832)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Unit 145 5425 East Bell Road Scottsdale, AZ 85254 United States
Date Received: 11 May 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 31 Dec 1985
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011