Hamilton, Andrew William (CPSO#: 90361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aguasabon Medical Clinic
PO Box 819
20 B Cartier Road
Terrace Bay ON  P0T 2W0
Phone: (807) 825-3235
Fax: (807) 825-3239
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW WILLIAM HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2012