Hamilton, Jill Krysti (CPSO#: 65102)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Division of Endocrinology
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5115
Fax: (416) 813-6304
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILL KRYSTI HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 01 Nov 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 02 Nov 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993