Hamilton, Joanne Marie (CPSO#: 87584)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2007 to 19 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 18 May 2017 to 31 May 2017
Elective Trainee - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2017