Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hamilton, John Gerard (CPSO#: 57155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2B
150 Sidney Street
Belleville ON  K8P 5E2
Phone: (613) 969-5217
Fax: 888-681-6493
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Gerard Hamilton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hamilton ( CPSO# 57155 )

Business Address:
Suite 2B
150 Sidney Street
Belleville ON  K8P 5E2
Phone Number: (613) 969-5217

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN GERARD HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1987