Hamilton, Magdalena Lynn (CPSO#: 33786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 1982

Summary

Former Name: Ganczarczyk, Magdalena Lynn (used until: 10 Nov 1982 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rosedale Medical Centre
600 Sherbourne Street
Suite 502
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 963-9292
Fax: (416) 963-8057
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul A. Hamilton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hamilton ( CPSO# 33786 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4354

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 02 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGDALENA LYNN HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1982