Hamilton, Michael John Archibald (CPSO#: 74899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
15900 Bayview Avenue
Aurora ON  L4G 7Y3
Phone: (905) 726-9755
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

194 Eagle Street
Newmarket ON
Newmarket ON  L3Y 4N8
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4381
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

4711 Yonge Street, Suite 501
Toronto ON  M2N 6K8
Canada
Phone: 416-733-3131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN ARCHIBALD HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2002