Hamilton, Robert James (CPSO#: 79420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 3-130
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2909
Fax: (416) 946-6590
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Hamilton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hamilton ( CPSO# 79420 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Suite 3-130
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012