Hamilton, Robert Murray (CPSO#: 58740)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Division Of Cardiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6142
Fax: (416) 813-7547
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Dec 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MURRAY HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1989