Hamilton, Thomas Rochester (CPSO#: 14526)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Durham, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Feb 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jan 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997