Hamilton, Trevor Douglas (CPSO#: 96899)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgical Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 18 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2012 to 10 Feb 2012
Elective Trainee - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2015