Hamilton, Wendy Elizabeth (CPSO#: 62212)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Westend FamilyCare Clinic
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Fax: (613) 599-3366
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamilton-Desai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 25 2006


Corporation Name: Hamilton-Desai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hamilton ( CPSO# 62212 )
Dr. D. Desai ( CPSO# 55414 )

Business Address:
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Business Address:
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone Number: (613) 725-2000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY ELIZABETH HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1991