Hammad, Waleed Mohammed Ali (CPSO#: 81700)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 27 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 28 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 18 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009