Hammett, David Clayton (CPSO#: 72189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kenora Medical Associates
c/o Paterson Medical Centre
45 Wolsley Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-3021
Fax: (807) 468-5565
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clayton Hammett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hammett ( CPSO# 72189 )

Business Address:
Patterson Medical Centre
45 Wolsley Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-3021

Business Address:
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 5, 2012
Expiry Date:  April 30, 2012
Summary:  
The College received notice from Lake of the Woods District Hospital that Dr. David C. Hammett's anesthesiology privileges were temporarily suspended from February 5, 2012 to April 30, 2012.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CLAYTON HAMMETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMMETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000