Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hammond, Lynda Catherine (CPSO#: 64025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3335 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 1S8
Phone: (226) 221-8000
Fax: (519) 962-5784
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNDA CATHERINE HAMMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMMOND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 18 Sep 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 19 Sep 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Sep 1992
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2009