Hammond, Michael Scott (CPSO#: 82726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand Bend Area CHC
69 Main St. E
Grand Bend ON  N0M 1T0
Phone: (519) 238-2362
Fax: (519) 238-6478
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hensall Medical Centre
122 King St.
Hensall ON  N0M 1X0
Canada
Phone: (519) 262-3140
Fax: (519) 262-2448
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Hammond Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hammond ( CPSO# 82726 )

Business Address:
Grand Bend Area CHC
69 Main Street East
Grand Bend ON  N0M 1T0
Phone Number: (519) 238-2362

Business Address:
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-2700

Business Address:
122 King Street
Hensall ON  N0M 1X0
Phone Number: (519) 262-3140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Huron Hospital Exeter

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL SCOTT HAMMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMMOND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007