Hammond, Robert Ralph (CPSO#: 58176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Pathology (Neuropath)
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36367
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 26 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT RALPH HAMMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMMOND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1988