Hamour, Faisal Awad (CPSO#: 78912)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Suite 605
5400 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5X7
Phone: (905) 356-4499
Fax: (905) 356-4493
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Hamour Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hamour ( CPSO# 78912 )

Business Address:
Suite 605
5400 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5X7
Phone Number: (905) 356-4499

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 02 Nov 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAISAL AWAD HAMOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 31 Mar 2003 to 28 Apr 2003
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

McMaster University, 29 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2006 to 01 Dec 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 02 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008