Hampe, Kyle Allen Wilfred (CPSO#: 67770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 May 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-600
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KYLE ALLEN WILFRED HAMPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMPE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 28 Feb 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Mar 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 28 Feb 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Mar 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2001