Han, Thomas Ming Kwang (CPSO#: 70243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
2065 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 745-2314
Fax: (416) 745-9336
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

12 Main Street North
Markham ON  L3P 1X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 471-9355
Fax: (905) 471-4348
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Han Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Han ( CPSO# 70243 )

Business Address:
402 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 745-2314

Business Address:
12 Main Street North
Markham ON  L3P 1X2
Phone Number: (905) 471-9355

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS MING KWANG HAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000