Han, Victor Khin Maung (CPSO#: 50828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Burmese, English

Education:Insitute of Medicine I, Rangoon, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
D4 215
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 64798
Fax: (519) 646-6123
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victor Han Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Han ( CPSO# 50828 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road E
Suite D4-215
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTOR KHIN MAUNG HAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1988