Hanada, Edwin Yoshiyuki (CPSO#: 78313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 602
5991 Spring Garden Road
Halifax NS  B3H 1Y6
Phone: 902-576-3329
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edwin Hanada Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hanada ( CPSO# 78313 )

Business Address:
St. John's Rehabilitation Hospital
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite S213
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Phone Number: (416) 226-6780

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 20 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWIN YOSHIYUKI HANADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANADA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2016