Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hanada, Philip Motokazu (CPSO#: 59523)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

201-60 Bridgeport Road
Waterloo ON  N2J 2J9
Canada
Phone: (519) 884-2500
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip Hanada Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hanada ( CPSO# 59523 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Wallace Oral & Maxillofacial Surgery
Suite 201
60 Bridgeport Road East
Waterloo ON  N2J 2J9
Phone Number: (519) 884-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP MOTOKAZU HANADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANADA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1991