Hanagandi, Prasad Baladev (CPSO#: 101415)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jawaharlal Nehru Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016