Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hancharyk, George (CPSO#: 19066)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2007