Hancock, David John (CPSO#: 22993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1970

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ajax & Pickering General Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Hancock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hancock ( CPSO# 22993 )

Business Address:
Ajax & Pickering General Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN HANCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANCOCK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1970

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Jul 1991
Summary:

 In July 1991, Dr. Hancock pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that are required 
 to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 27(3); and in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21).  The Discipline Committee accepted 
 this plea, and found Dr. Hancock guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee 
 ordered that Dr. Hancock be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
 Register.  The Committee further ruled that the Doctor's licence was to be suspended for a period 
 of three months, with the second and third months of the suspension to be themselves suspended if 
 he complied with a monitoring program for two years, as follows:  a person, not from Dr. Hancock's 
 hospital, satisfactory to the Registrar, was to review one week's emergency room charts per month, 
 at random, the week to be the monitor's choice; and a report was to be submitted to the Registrar 
 that would satisfy him that Dr. Hancock was maintaining the standard of practice.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 12 Jan 1993
Hearing Date(s): 05 Jul 1991

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 23, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 23, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)