Hancock, Gregg William (CPSO#: 66392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
360 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5T5
Phone: (519) 271-1912
Fax: (519) 271-5772
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gregg Hancock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hancock ( CPSO# 66392 )

Business Address:
360 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5T5
Phone Number: (519) 271-1912

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGG WILLIAM HANCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANCOCK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1998