Hancock, Wendy Patricia (CPSO#: 50674)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Hancock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 6 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Hamilton Health Sciences 237 Barton Street E Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Date Received: 27 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1989 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017