Hancox, Robert John (CPSO#: 74627)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 May 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Birmingham, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 23 May 2001
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 May 2001