Handelsman, Sam (CPSO#: 30217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 315
2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone: (416) 235-0814
Fax: (416) 235-0351
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Handelsman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Handelsman ( CPSO# 30217 )

Business Address:
Suite 315
2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone Number: (416) 235-0814

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAM HANDELSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANDELSMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1978