Handford, Curtis David (CPSO#: 76192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Health Centre
4th Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone: (416) 867-3728
Fax: (416) 867-3726
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CURTIS DAVID HANDFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANDFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2003