Handley-Derry, Mark Henry (CPSO#: 50676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
658 Danforth Avenue
Suite 210
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone: (416) 461-3937
Fax: (416) 461-7425
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Handley-Derry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Handley-Derry ( CPSO# 50676 )

Business Address:
210 - 658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone Number: (416) 461-3937

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK HENRY HANDLEY-DERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANDLEY-DERRY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1987