Hands, Brian William (CPSO#: 21919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
200 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1R1
Phone: (416) 922-0070
Fax: 416-922-0071
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian W. Hands Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hands ( CPSO# 21919 )

Business Address:
200 St. Clair Avenue West
Suite 406
Toronto ON  M4V 1R1
Phone Number: (416) 922-0070

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN WILLIAM HANDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANDS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971