Handscomb, Arthur Robert George (CPSO#: 22288)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Sep 2008
Summary:

 On September 8, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Handscomb to have committed acts of 
 professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.  
 The Discipline Committee ordered the following: 

1) 	that Dr. Handscomb appear before the 
 Discipline Committee to be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
 register.

2) 	That Dr. Handscombe pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 by October 
 8, 2008.

3)  	 Directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 08, 2008