Handscomb, Sheina Elspeth Wilson (CPSO#: 25181)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Harrow Health Clinic Incorporated 1480 County Road 13 Harrow ON N0R 1G0 Phone: 519-738-2000
Date Received: 14 Oct 2014


Address: Tippett Richardson Records Management 201 Sheppard Street East Windsor, ON N8X 2K6 Tel: (519) 254-5111
Date Received: 12 Dec 2008

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Oct 2014