Handysides, Allan Robert (CPSO#: 19896)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 201 2115 Finch Avenue West North York, ON M3N 2V6
Date Received: 18 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2014