Hang-Fu, Lee Chaul Drum (CPSO#: 52664)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: Hang Fu, Chaul Drum (used until: 02 Dec 1987 )

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989