Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hanham, William James (CPSO#: 15407)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 1996