Haniff, Michelle Ferrial (CPSO#: 98637)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
Division of Medicine
10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Joseph Brant Hospital
GIMRAC Clinic-Dept of Medicine
1230 North Shore Blvd
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: 905-632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle F. Haniff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Haniff ( CPSO# 98637 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Healthcare
Division of Nephrology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
1200 Main Street
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE FERRIAL HANIFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANIFF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2015