Hanlon, John George (CPSO#: 83033)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5561
Fax: (416) 864-5854
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Womens College Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 416-323-6269
Fax: 416-323-2666
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
Dept. of Anesthesia and Pain Mgmt.
200 Elizabeth Street 3EN-464
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: 416 340 5164
Fax: 416 340 3698
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John G. Hanlon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hanlon ( CPSO# 83033 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Shuter Wing, 1-028F
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5561

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN GEORGE HANLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANLON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010