Hanna, Albert Hanna Henin (CPSO#: 92174)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glazier Medical Centre
Department of Family Medicine
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1228
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hanna ( CPSO# 92174 )

Business Address:
Glazier Medical Centre
Department of Family Medicine
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBERT HANNA HENIN HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2010 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011