Hanna, Amir Kamel (CPSO#: 29091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
61 Queen Street East
6th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3721
Fax: (416) 867-3724
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amir Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hanna ( CPSO# 29091 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
6th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3721

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIR KAMEL HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1977