Hanna, John Raafat (CPSO#: 107463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hanna ( CPSO# 107463)

Business Address:
St. Catharine General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 06 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN RAAFAT HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2017