Hannigan, Neil Ross (CPSO#: 72081)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 09 Feb 1998 to 08 Mar 1998
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2007