Hanninen, Mikael Veijo Wilfred (CPSO#: 88130)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Mar 2008 to 06 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Jan 2011 to 18 Feb 2011
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 May 2012 to 06 May 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 07 May 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Nov 2013